HOLLEY v. WILKIE

Plaintiff: EVELYN O HOLLEY
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Case Number: 2:2018cv00350
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer by ROBERT WILKIE Responses due by 11/23/2018. (CONCANNON, JAMES). Added MOTION to Transfer on 11/2/2018 (sfw).
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Re: Complaint as to ROBERT WILKIE served on 9/7/2018. (sfw) Modified on 9/20/2018 to change "Acknowledgment" to "Certificate" and to remove Answer deadline as this deadline was set in error(sfw).
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ROBERT WILKIE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
September 5, 2018 Filing Fee Received from EVELYN O HOLLEY: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 218001566. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 9/5/2018 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by EVELYN O HOLLEY (bfa)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT WILKIE with Jury Demand, filed by EVELYN O HOLLEY. (Service of Process Deadline 12/4/2018) (Attachments: #1 Part 1 pgs 7-37, #2 Part 2 pgs 38-167, #3 Part 4 pgs 168-230, #4 Part 5 pgs 231-248, #5 Part 6 pgs 249-273, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLEY v. WILKIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN O HOLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT WILKIE
Represented By: JAMES D. CONCANNON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?