BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST v. PHOENIX et al

Plaintiff: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A WITHAM and PHOENIX
Case Number: 2:2018cv00351
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31325
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 6, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1895885.), filed by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST.(ECONOMY, ALLISON)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER A WITHAM. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (mlm)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Filing of Complaint for Foreclosure. Original attested document forwarded to counsel of record for plaintiff. (mlm)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mlm)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 12/4/2018) Fee due by 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter dated 3/14/13, #2 Exhibit B-Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C-Abstract of Title, #4 Exhibit D-Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E-UCC Elecronic Filing Acknowledgement, #6 Exhibit F-Promissory Note 7/31/08, #7 Exhibit G-Mortgage Deed, #8 Exhibit H-Conditional Assignment of Leases and Rentals, #9 Exhibit I-Notice to Cure Default 4/10/18, #10 Exhibit J-Notice ot Cure Default 2)(mlm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST v. PHOENIX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER A WITHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHOENIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAR HARBOR BANK & TRUST
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?