LAUZIER v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA

Plaintiff: NORMAND LAUZIER
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00363
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER:Administrative Record due by 11/15/2018. Deadline for filing of Motion for Judgment on the Record for Judicial Review: 1/2/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(DECKER, BYRNE)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing with Attachments, #3 Summons/Return of Service, #4 Summary Sheet, #5 Complaint)(SILVER, STEVEN)
September 18, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline: Answer due by 10/17/2018. (jib)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's complaint by October 17, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (DECKER, BYRNE)
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA Responses due by 10/4/2018. (DECKER, BYRNE)
September 11, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1897769.), filed by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(DECKER, BYRNE)
September 11, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA : Answer due by 9/17/2018. (bfa)
September 11, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/18/2018. (bfa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 9/18/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oxford County Superior Court, case number CV-18-36. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 12/10/2018) Fee due by 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 transmittal letter, #2 complaint, #3 summons, #4 notice regarding electronic service)(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #5 notice of filing notice of removal) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAUZIER v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAND LAUZIER
Represented By: ANDREW S. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?