CAPODILUPO v. INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: ANTHONY CAPODILUPO
Defendant: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00388
Filed: September 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 SET Deadlines Per Order #13: Status Report due by 3/22/2019. (slg)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. Unless the Court orders otherwise, this matter is stayed until March 22, 2019. The parties shall file a status report on or about March 1, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Stay by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 12/11/2018. (CAHOON, JOSEPH)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #1 Notice of Removal. The exhibits to attachment (1) complaint were separated to be separate exhibits to the complaint. (bfa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 First AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (CAHOON, JOSEPH)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #8 State Court Record: Docket entry modified to remove duplicate attachment descriptions. (jib)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C- Executed Summons, #4 Exhibit D- Notice of Removal)(CAHOON, JOSEPH) Modified on 10/11/2018 to remove duplicate attachment text (jib).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/11/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/19/2019. Motions due by 3/4/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/6/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTHONY CAPODILUPO. (CAMPBELL, JOHN)
September 24, 2018 Filing Fee Received from INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 218001632. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 9/24/2018 re #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/1/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
September 23, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (bfa)
September 23, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(bfa)
September 23, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
September 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln County Superior Court, case number not assigned. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 12/24/2018) Fee due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 complaint)(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (bfa). Modified on 10/16/2018 to indicate the additional attachments are the same exhibits to attachment (1) complaint as separate exhibits (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPODILUPO v. INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY CAPODILUPO
Represented By: JOHN S. CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTEGON NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. CAHOON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?