HUFNAGEL v. BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC
Plaintiff: JULIE HUFNAGEL
Defendant: BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00402
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
2 Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY no longer assigned to the case. (mjlt)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/19/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 2/26/2019. Motions due by 3/12/2019. Ready for Trial on 5/6/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jib)
October 2, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1907962.), filed by BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC.(HASKINS, KEVIN)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC.(bfa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC. (bfa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC. No PDF document attached. See #1 Notice of Removal. (bfa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2018-00375. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC. (Service of Process Deadline 12/31/2018) Fee due by 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Summons, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Summary Sheet, #4 Exhibit D Acknowledgement of Receipt of Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit E Docket Record, #6 Exhibit F Notice to Superior Court)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUFNAGEL v. BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIO-MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF MAINE INC
Represented By: STEPHEN E. F. LANGSDORF
Represented By: KEVIN HASKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE HUFNAGEL
Represented By: SARAH A. CHURCHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?