UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $483,855.52 IN US CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $483,855.52 IN US CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00412
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to $483,855.52 IN US CURRENCY served on 10/19/2018. (CLARK, DONALD)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting without objection #4 Motion to Stay. On the showing made, this matter is stayed for a period of 90 days, or until January 15, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Responses due by 11/7/2018. (CLARK, DONALD)
October 11, 2018 Case Unsealed per Motion filed with case opening document and per filing of superseding indictment. (lrc)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal. The government's motion to seal this matter is granted until such time as an anticipated superseding indictment in 2:18-cr-00063-GZS is unsealed. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 Verified Complaint for Forfeiture against $483,855.52 IN US CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/2/2019) (Attachments: #1 Verification signed by Task Force Officer, Barry Kelly)(lrc)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (lrc) Modified on 10/11/2018 to removed sealed text from docket entry (lrc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $483,855.52 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $483,855.52 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DONALD E. CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?