SEA SALT LLC v. BELLEROSE et al
Plaintiff: SEA SALT LLC
Defendant: AMANDA F BELLEROSE, MATTHEW R BELLEROSE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC, ANTHONY J MASTROPASQUA, EAST END TRANSPORT LLC and VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA
Petitioner: BANK OF AMERICA NA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00413
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Clarification and Amendment of Memorandum of Decision. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
November 26, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Joint MOTION for Clarification and Amendment of #18 Memorandum of Decision on Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment filed by AMANDA F BELLEROSE. (WHITMAN, JOHN)
November 19, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for AMANDA BELLEROSE : Answer due by 1/14/2019. (mlm)
November 19, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed . (WHITE, LAURA)
November 19, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Notice of Removal for MATTHEW R BELLEROSE: Answer due by 1/14/2019. (mtm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to MATTHEW R. BELLEROSE. Waiver sent on 11/14/2018. (WHITE, LAURA) Modified on 11/19/2018 to clarify docket text (mtm).
November 16, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Notice of Removal for VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA : Answer due by 1/14/2019. (sfw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA. Waiver sent on 11/14/2018 . (WHITE, LAURA) Modified on 11/16/2018 to clarify docket text (lrc).
November 16, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 Joint MOTION for Clarification and Amendment of #18 Memorandum of Decision on Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment filed by SEA SALT LLC. Reply due by 11/30/2018. (WHITE, LAURA)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Clarification and Amendment of #18 Memorandum of Decision on Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment by AMANDA F BELLEROSE Responses due by 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Exhibit 1))(WHITMAN, JOHN) Modified on 11/15/2018 to clarify docket text (sfw).(sfw).
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to AMANDA F BELLEROSE, MATTHEW R BELLEROSE, EAST END TRANSPORT LLC, ANTHONY J MASTROPASQUA, VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Vincent J. Mastropasqua, #2 Summons Issued as to Anthony J. Mastropasqua, #3 Summons Issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc., #4 Summons Issued as to Amanda F. Bellerose, #5 Summons Issued as to East End Transport, LLC)(sfw)
October 29, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION granting in part 6 Motion to Vacate or Modify Attachment. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Oral Argument held re 6 MOTION to Vacate Attachment or MOTION to Modify Attachment filed by AMANDA F BELLEROSE. (Court Reporter: Dennis Ford) (jib)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on 6 MOTION to Vacate Attachment or MOTION to Modify Attachment: Oral Argument set for 10/23/2018 at 2:15 PM in Portland Courtroom 3 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON: Telephone Conference held. (Court Reporter: FTR) (MFS)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SEA SALT LLC. (WHITE, LAURA)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA H. WHITE on behalf of SEA SALT LLC (WHITE, LAURA)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #11 Notice of Appearance : This docket entry was modified to indicate it is a duplicate entry of Docket Entry No. 10. (sfw)
October 15, 2018 Filing 11 *DUPLICATE ENTRY* NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. HADIARIS on behalf of MATTHEW R BELLEROSE (HADIARIS, JOSHUA) Modified on 10/15/2018 to indicate duplicate entry (sfw).
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. MARJERISON , JOSHUA D HADIARIS on behalf of MATTHEW R BELLEROSE (MARJERISON, THOMAS) Modified on 10/15/2018 to add "Joshua D Hadiaris" text to this docket entry as his name is included on the notice (sfw).
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA.(SMITH, TYLER)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. The parties have been provided with the Court's call-in information.(MFS)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER mooting 6 Motion to Intervene. The movant has been joined as a defendant in the matter. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 10, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA per F.R.Civ.P. 81(c): Answer due by 10/12/2018. (jwr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION to Vacate Attachment or MOTION to Modify Attachment filed in State Court (No PDF Attached. See ECF [5-27] for Motion and ECF [5-28] for Response to Motion) by AMANDA F BELLEROSE (jwr)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket Record, #2 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits, #3 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 1), #4 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 2), #5 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 3), #6 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 4), #7 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 5), #8 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 6), #9 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 7), #10 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 8), #11 2018.08.03 State Court Ex Parte Motion for Order of Attachment & Affidavits (Part 9), #12 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Town & Country FCU, #13 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Norway Savings Bank, #14 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Saco & Bidd Savings Bank, #15 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - cPort CU, #16 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Coast Line CU, #17 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Gorham SB, #18 2018.08.14 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Machia Savings Bank, #19 2018.08.14 State Court EOA (G. Libby & T. Smith) & Motion to Dissolve - DF Vincent Mastropasqua, #20 2018.08.15 State Court NOH - Motion to Dissolve 8-17-18, #21 2018.08.17 State Court PL's Opp to Motion to Dissolve Attachment, #22 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Bangor Savings Bank, #23 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Key Bank, #24 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - People's United, #25 2018.08.23 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Camden National Bank, #26 2018.08.27 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - Bank of America, #27 2018.08.28 State Court A. Bellerose Mtn to Intervene, Vacate or Modify Attachment, #28 2018.08.28 State Court V. Mastropasqua No Opp to A. Bellerose Motion to Intervene, etc., #29 2018.09.10 State Court ORDER Dissolving Trustee Attachment as to Vincent Mastropasqua, #30 2018.09.10 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - PayPal, #31 2018.09.18 State Court Trustee Stmt Under Oath - TD Bank, #32 2018.09.24 State Court PL's Mtn to Extend DL to Oppose M to Intervene, #33 2018.09.26 State Court PL's Opp to A. Bellerose Mtn to Intervene, #34 2018.09.26 State Court ORDER Granting PL's Mtn to Extend, #35 2018.09.26 State Court NOH - Mtn to Intervene set for 10-24-18, #36 2018.10.02 State Court A. Bellerose Mtn to extend DL to Reply to PL Opposition, #37 2018.10.03 State Court ORDER Granting Motion to Extend)(LIBBY, GENE)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION to Vacate or MOTION to Modify filed by AMANDA F BELLEROSE. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Amanda Bellerose, #2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from exhibits to Mr. McEwen's affidavit)(WHITMAN, JOHN) Modified on 10/10/2018 to link to ECF 6 (jwr).
October 9, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1910902.), filed by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA.(LIBBY, GENE)
October 5, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/12/2018 from plaintiff SEA SALT, LLC. (sfw)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 10/12/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Pleadings Complaint, First Amended Complaint from York County Superior Court, case number CV-18-144. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/3/2019) Fee due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint filed in CV-18-144, #2 Exhibit B: First Amended Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Exhibit D: Ex Parte Order Approving Attachment and Attachment by Trustee Process, #5 Exhibit E: Order Dissolving Attachment and Trustee Process As To Defendant Vincent J Mastropasqua)(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEA SALT LLC v. BELLEROSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA F BELLEROSE
Represented By: JOHN S. WHITMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW R BELLEROSE
Represented By: THOMAS S. MARJERISON
Represented By: JOSHUA D. HADIARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY J MASTROPASQUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAST END TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT J MASTROPASQUA
Represented By: TYLER J. SMITH
Represented By: GENE R. LIBBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEA SALT LLC
Represented By: LAURA H. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BANK OF AMERICA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?