GRAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: H CHARLES GRAY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2018cv00415
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by H CHARLES GRAY. (HARMON, CHRISTOPHER)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #4 Affidavit of Service : This docket entry was modified to reflect that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (lrc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR**AFFIDAVIT of Service by H CHARLES GRAY. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 10/19/2018. (HARMON, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 11/27/2018 to reflect that this filing was made in error (lrc).
October 10, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1911581.), filed by H CHARLES GRAY.(HARMON, CHRISTOPHER)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for U.S. Attorney)(jwr)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand filed by H CHARLES GRAY. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 1/3/2019) Fee due by 10/9/2018.(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H CHARLES GRAY
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. HARMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?