KRISTIANSEN v. TOWN OF KITTERY et al

Plaintiff: KATHLEEN A KRISTIANSEN
Defendant: KITTERY POLICE DEPARTMENT, STEVE HAMEL, EDWARD F STRONG, TOWN OF KITTERY, ROBERT S. HUNDLEY, RONALD AVERY, GARY D FINLEY and ROBERT S HUNDLEY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00420
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by KITTERY POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWN OF KITTERY Responses due by 12/27/2018. (PARK, KASIA)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed KITTERY POLICE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 10/15/2018; TOWN OF KITTERY waiver sent on 10/15/2018.Answer due by 12/14/2018. (sfw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KASIA S. PARK on behalf of KITTERY POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWN OF KITTERY (PARK, KASIA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR on behalf of KITTERY POLICE DEPARTMENT, TOWN OF KITTERY (BENJAMIN, EDWARD)
October 11, 2018 Filing Fee Received from KATHLEEN A KRISTIANSEN: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 219000063. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 10/11/2018 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by KATHLEEN A KRISTIANSEN (bfa)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RONALD AVERY, GARY D FINLEY, STEVE HAMEL, ROBERT S. HUNDLEY, KITTERY POLICE DEPARTMENT, EDWARD F STRONG, TOWN OF KITTERY with Jury Demand, filed by KATHLEEN A KRISTIANSEN. (Service of Process Deadline 1/9/2019)(bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: #1 envelope) (bfa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRISTIANSEN v. TOWN OF KITTERY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KITTERY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE HAMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD F STRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF KITTERY
Represented By: EDWARD R. BENJAMIN, JR.
Represented By: KASIA S. PARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT S. HUNDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD AVERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY D FINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT S HUNDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN A KRISTIANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?