BIOMUNE COMPANY v. CLEAR H2O INC
Plaintiff: BIOMUNE COMPANY
Defendant: CLEAR H2O INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00423
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party by CLEAR H2O INC Responses due by 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Affidavit Of Jeffrey Joyce, Esq.)(PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY). Added MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Necessary Party on 12/6/2018 (sfw).
November 13, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for CLEARH20 INC Per Order #13: Answer due by 12/6/2018. (sfw)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to December 6, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by CLEAR H2O INC Responses due by 12/3/2018. (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CLEAR H2O INC. (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY T. PIAMPIANO on behalf of CLEAR H2O INC (PIAMPIANO, JEFFREY)
October 26, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for CLEAR H2O INC per pleading #9: Answer due by 11/15/2018. (mlm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BIOMUNE COMPANY. CLEAR H2O INC served on 10/25/2018. (HIRSHON, SARA)
October 22, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for CLEAR H2O INC : Answer due by 11/6/2018. (sfw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BIOMUNE COMPANY. CLEAR H2O INC served on 10/16/2018. (HIRSHON, SARA)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Phillippe J.C. Signore, Esq. filed by SARA ELIZABETH HIRSHON on behalf of BIOMUNE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1914914.) (HIRSHON, SARA)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lisa M. Mandrusiak, Esq. filed by SARA ELIZABETH HIRSHON on behalf of BIOMUNE COMPANY (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1913925.) (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Admission of Tia D. Fenton, Esq., #2 Pro Hac Vice Admission of Andrew M. Ollis, Esq.)(HIRSHON, SARA)
October 15, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1913899.), filed by BIOMUNE COMPANY.(HIRSHON, SARA)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (bfa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CLEAR H2O INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BIOMUNE COMPANY. (bfa)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLEAR H2O INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by BIOMUNE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 1/10/2019) Fee due by 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 185 patent, #2 Exhibit B - patent assignment Lee to Vetech, #3 Exhibit C - patent assignment Vetech to Ceva, #4 Exhibit D - GelDrop product sheet, #5 Exhibit E - HydroDrop product sheet, #6 Exhibit F - screen shot from ClearH2Os website, #7 Exhibit G - screen shot from Farm.com)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIOMUNE COMPANY v. CLEAR H2O INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIOMUNE COMPANY
Represented By: LISA M. MANDRUSIAK
Represented By: ANDREW M. OLLIS
Represented By: SARA ELIZABETH HIRSHON
Represented By: SETH S. COBURN
Represented By: TIA D. FENTON
Represented By: PHILIPPE J.C. SIGNORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAR H2O INC
Represented By: JEFFREY T. PIAMPIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?