BAILEY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP et al
Plaintiff: KERRI J BAILEY
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC and WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv00428
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 1/14/2019 08:30 AM in Portland Visiting Judge's Chambers before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON, In Camera Settlement Papers due by 1/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting relief in #9 Objection to Scheduling Order; the deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order are stayed. The Court will address the Scheduling Order with the parties following the judicial settlement conference, if necessary. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 Joint OBJECTION to #8 Scheduling Order, filed by KERRI J BAILEY. Responses due by 12/7/2018. (WEBBERT, DAVID)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/18/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/25/2019. Motions due by 4/8/2019. Ready for Trial on 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP, WAL-MART STORES INC.(RAND, KATHARINE)
October 22, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for WAL-MART STORES EAST LP and WAL-MART STORES INC per Order No. 6 entered on 10/22/2018: Answer due by 10/29/2018. (lrc)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to October 29, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP, WAL-MART STORES INC Responses due by 11/13/2018. (RAND, KATHARINE)
October 17, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1915577.), filed by WAL-MART STORES INC, WAL-MART STORES EAST LP.(RAND, KATHARINE)
October 16, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for WAL-MART STORES EAST LP, WAL-MART STORES INC : Answer due by 10/22/2018. (bfa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP, WAL-MART STORES INC. (bfa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP, WAL-MART STORES INC. (Attachments: #1 docket record, #2 complaint, #3 summary sheet, #4 summons)(bfa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oxford County Superior Court, case number CV-18-00034. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES INC, WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Service of Process Deadline 1/14/2019) Fee due by 10/17/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAILEY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES INC
Represented By: KATHARINE I. RAND
Represented By: DANIEL R. STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Represented By: KATHARINE I. RAND
Represented By: DANIEL R. STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRI J BAILEY
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?