JOSEPH v. LINCARE INC et al
Plaintiff: JEFFREY JOSEPH
Defendant: LINCARE INC, PATRICK BUTCHER, BRIGHTON MEDICAL SERVICES INC and FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER
Case Number: 2:2018cv00443
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
2 Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint, Set Answer Deadline: Answer due from Butcher and Family Practice on the River by 12/28/2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/29/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 5/6/2019. Motions due by 5/20/2019. Ready for Trial on 7/8/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
December 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANA M. MCCORMICK on behalf of LINCARE INC (MCCORMICK, JEANA)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by LINCARE INC.(HEWEY, MELISSA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of James A. Clifford filed by JEFFREY JOSEPH re Answers from PATRICK BUTCHER and FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Envelope and 11-27-18 letter, #2 Exhibit 3-23-17 letter)(CLIFFORD, JAMES) Modified on 12/3/2018 to clarify docket text (jwr).
December 3, 2018 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 1/3/2019 as to PATRICK BUTCHER and FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER. (jwr)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LINCARE INC. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
November 19, 2018 Set Answer Deadline Regarding #12 Summons Returned Executed and #13 Summons Returned Executed for FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER and PATRICK BUTCHER: Answer due by 11/30/2018. (jgd)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY JOSEPH. FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER served on 11/9/2018. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
November 19, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY JOSEPH. PATRICK BUTCHER served on 11/9/2018. (CLIFFORD, JAMES)
November 16, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for LINCARE INC per Order #11: Answer due by 12/7/2018. (jgd)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. Time is extended to December 7, 2018. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
November 16, 2018 Set Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/23/2018 from LINCARE INC. (jgd)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, by LINCARE INC Responses due by 12/7/2018. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. HEWEY on behalf of LINCARE INC (HEWEY, MELISSA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #7 Certificate of Service : This docket entry has been modified to reflect that it is a summons returned executed not a certificate of service. (jwr)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JEFFREY JOSEPH. LINCARE INC served on 10/30/2018. (CLIFFORD, JAMES) Modified on 11/7/2018 to indicate this is a summons return (jwr).
October 30, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. JUDGE JON D. LEVY no longer assigned to the case. (mjlt)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (akr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #4 Amended Complaint, : This entry has been modified to add FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER. (akr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against PATRICK BUTCHER, LINCARE INC, and FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER filed by JEFFREY JOSEPH. (Service of Process Deadline 1/23/2019)(COTTER, ANDREW) Modified on 10/26/2018 to add FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER (akr).
October 24, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1919623.), filed by JEFFREY JOSEPH.(COTTER, ANDREW)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRIGHTON MEDICAL SERVICES INC, PATRICK BUTCHER, LINCARE INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Patrick Butcher summons, #2 Lincare Inc summons)(bfa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRIGHTON MEDICAL SERVICES INC, PATRICK BUTCHER, LINCARE INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JEFFREY JOSEPH. (Service of Process Deadline 1/22/2019) Fee due by 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 3/23/17 Butcher Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 3/27/17 Adams email to Filo-Loos, #3 Exhibit 3 - 8/21/17 Filo-Loos Statement)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOSEPH v. LINCARE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCARE INC
Represented By: JEANA M. MCCORMICK
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK BUTCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIGHTON MEDICAL SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAMILY PRACTICE ON THE RIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY JOSEPH
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?