DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY v. THERRIEN
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Defendant: BONNIE L THERRIEN
Case Number: 2:2018cv00458
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing Fee Received from DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 0100-1924361. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Case Opening Fee. Date Paid: 11/2/2018 (sfw)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BONNIE L THERRIEN. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (bfa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BONNIE L THERRIEN PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 1/29/2019) Fee due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - legal description, #2 Exhibit B - promissory note delivered to Ameriquest Mortgage Company, #3 Exhibit C - mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - assignment of mortgage to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, #5 Exhibit E - demand letter, #6 Exhibit F - certificate of mailing, #7 Exhibit G - military statement)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY v. THERRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNIE L THERRIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: TRISTAN E. BIRKENMEIER
Represented By: CARLY J. TRAUB
Represented By: ANDREW J. SCHAEFER
Represented By: SANTO LONGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?