SHORTILL v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: THOMAS SHORTILL
Defendant: UNUM CORPORATION, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00460
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER to Cumberland County Superior Court re Order granting without objection #10 Motion to Remand to State Court (akr)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting without objection #10 Motion to Remand to State Court By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (HORNBY, D.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION Responses due by 12/21/2018. (DECKER, BYRNE)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/11/2018. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 4/16/2019. Motions due by 4/30/2019. Ready for Trial on 7/8/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (slg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION.(DECKER, BYRNE)
November 14, 2018 Reset Answer Deadline for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION per Order #7: Answer due by 11/16/2018. (jib)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (HORNBY, D.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Stipulation of Dismissal of Fewer than all Defendants, #5 Acceptance of Service, #6 Order on Defs' Consent Motion to Enlarge Deadline to Service Responsive Pleading, #7 Report of ADR Conference and Order, #8 Consented to Motion to Enlarge Deadline to Serve Responsive Pleading, #9 Order on Motion for Enlargement of time to File Answer, #10 Entry of Appearance, #11 Anthoine's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer, #12 Order on Plf's 2nd Motion for Enlargement of Time, #13 Pfl's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time, #14 Summons, #15 Order on Plf's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Process, #16 Plf's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Process, #17 Complaint, #18 Summary Sheet)(SILVER, STEVEN)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re Set/Reset Answer Deadline by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION Responses due by 12/4/2018. (SILVER, STEVEN)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION. (DECKER, BYRNE)
November 6, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1925187.), filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DECKER, BYRNE)
November 6, 2018 Set Answer Deadline for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION : Answer due by 11/13/2018. (bfa)
November 6, 2018 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/9/2018. (bfa)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 11/13/2018. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-87. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, UNUM CORPORATION, PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 2/4/2019) Fee due by 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stipulation to Dismiss Cover Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Form 10-k, #5 Exhibit 5 - Letter to State Court)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHORTILL v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS SHORTILL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER C. TAINTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM CORPORATION
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL REVERE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BYRNE J. DECKER
Represented By: STEVEN J. SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?