ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC et al v. MISS BEHAVIN M/V
Plaintiff: ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC and ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC
Defendant: MISS BEHAVIN M/V
Case Number: 2:2018cv00464
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31325
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (lrc)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankruptcy petition of owner of vessel)(BRADEN, TWAIN)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF NOTICE granting #5 Motion for Service by Publication By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice) (akr)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 WARRANT In Rem Issued By Deputy Clerk: Lindsey Caron for JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR MARITIME ARREST OF M/V MISS BEHAVIN' granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN granting #3 Motion to Appoint Custodian By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
November 9, 2018 Filing Fee Received from ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 219000203. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 11/9/2018 (lrc)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC. (bfa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement : Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to reflect that it was filed in error with the wrong document attached and will be re-docketed by the Clerk's Office. (mnw)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC. (bfa) Modified on 11/8/2018 to add filed in error notation (mnw).
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Service by Publication by ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC (bfa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #1 proposed order) (bfa).
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(bfa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - insurance policy, #2 proposed order)(bfa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MISS BEHAVIN M/V PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC, ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC. (Service of Process Deadline 2/6/2019) Fee due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - boatyard invoices, #2 Exhibit B - boat repair invoices)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC et al v. MISS BEHAVIN M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROYAL RIVER BOATYARD INC
Represented By: TWAIN BRADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROYAL RIVER BOAT REPAIR INC
Represented By: TWAIN BRADEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISS BEHAVIN M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?