COFFIN v. AMETEK INC et al
Plaintiff: VICTOR COFFIN
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND INC, BATH IRON WORKS, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, AMETEK INC, GAGE COMPANY, MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY, CBS CORPORATION and HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00472
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON C. BARRETT on behalf of MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY (BARRETT, JASON)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. (PORTER, GLEN)
December 27, 2018 SET Deadlines: Per Local Rule 7.1, Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement from MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY due by 1/4/2019. (slg)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY.(MOHAN, CATHERINE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE A. MOHAN on behalf of GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (MOHAN, CATHERINE)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CBS CORPORATION. (STOUDER, ELIZABETH)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to All Pending and Future Cross Claims by CBS CORPORATION.(STOUDER, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/21/2018 to clean up text (slg).
December 18, 2018 RESET Answer Deadline for MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY Per Order #8: Answer due by 1/18/2019. (slg)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer. Time is extended to January 18, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to file Answer by MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. Responses due by 1/8/2019. (PORTER, GLEN) Modified on 12/18/2018 to remove duplicate motion part (slg).
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph J. Cirilano filed by KEVIN M. NOONAN on behalf of VICTOR COFFIN(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Coffin) (NOONAN, KEVIN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #4 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice : Docket entry modified by the Clerk's Office to clean up docket text to reflect that the Certification attached is only for Attorney Jason T. Shipp. (mnw)
November 16, 2018 Filing Fee Received from VICTOR COFFIN(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Coffin), VICTOR COFFIN(an individual): Amount Paid: $200. Receipt Number: 0100-1930334. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: Pro Hac Vice Certification. Date Paid: 11/16/2018 re #4 Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (bfa)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason T. Shipp filed by KEVIN M. NOONAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (NOONAN, KEVIN) Modified on 11/19/2018 to clean up docket text to reflect that the Certification attached is only for Attorney Jason T. Shipp (mnw).
November 16, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1930302.), filed by VICTOR COFFIN(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Coffin).(NOONAN, KEVIN)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AMETEK INC, BATH IRON WORKS, CBS CORPORATION, GAGE COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC, INGERSOLL-RAND INC, MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 CBS CORPORATION summons, #2 GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY summons, #3 HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC, #4 INGERSOLL-RAND, INC summons, #5 MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY summons, #6 BATH IRON WORKS CORPORATION summons, #7 GAGE COMPANY summons)(bfa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMETEK INC, BATH IRON WORKS, CBS CORPORATION, GAGE COMPANY, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC, INGERSOLL-RAND INC, MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by VICTOR COFFIN(as Personal Representative of the Estate of Linda Coffin), VICTOR COFFIN(an individual). (Service of Process Deadline 2/13/2019) Fee due by 11/19/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COFFIN v. AMETEK INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BATH IRON WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: CATHERINE A. MOHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMETEK INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAGE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINE CENTRAL RAILROAD COMPANY
Represented By: GLEN L. PORTER
Represented By: JASON C. BARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: ELIZABETH G. STOUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR COFFIN
Represented By: JOSEPH CIRILANO
Represented By: KEVIN M. NOONAN
Represented By: JASON T. SHIPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?