GROTTON v. SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC

Plaintiff: APRIL GROTTON
Defendant: SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00504
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL P. SCHWARZ on behalf of SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
January 7, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC - Per Order #6: Answer due by 2/22/2019. (mnw)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting without objection #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by February 22, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC by 1/14/2019. (mnw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint from January 23, 2019 to February 22, 2019 by SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC Responses due by 1/28/2019. (SCHWARZ, DANIEL)
January 7, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC Per return of service #4: Answer due by 1/23/2019. (slg)
January 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by APRIL GROTTON. SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC served on 1/2/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
December 26, 2018 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1948228.), filed by APRIL GROTTON.(TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by APRIL GROTTON. (Service of Process Deadline 3/19/2019) Fee due by 12/21/2018.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GROTTON v. SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By: DANIEL P. SCHWARZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL GROTTON
Represented By: ALLAN K. TOWNSEND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?