PENKUL v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: LINDA PENKUL
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 Correspondence by LINDA PENKUL. (Attachments: #1 Information About Supplemental Security Income Payments, #2 Envelope)(mnw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence filed by LINDA PENKUL. (Attachments: #1 Social Security Administration Supplemental Security Income Information Letter, #2 Envelope)(jib)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINDA PENKUL re #7 Correspondence, (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINDA PENKUL re #8 Correspondence, #2 Envelope)(jib)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence filed by LINDA PENKUL. (Attachments: #1 Social Security Administration Supplemental Security Income Notice of Reconsideration, #2 Letter from Nina Gianni dated 10/1/2018, #3 Envelope)(mnw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LINDA PENKUL re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS re #1 Complaint,. Main Document: envelope. (bfa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office providing Information for Pro Se Parties handout. (bfa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LINDA PENKUL (bfa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by LINDA PENKUL. (Service of Process Deadline 4/17/2019) (Attachments: #1 September SSI payment decision documents, #2 November SSI payment decision documents, #3 US Supreme Court correspondence, #4 Town of Lebanon, York County correspondence)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENKUL v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA PENKUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?