LEDESMA v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: SHARON ANN LEDESMA
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00039
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 10 PROCEDURAL ORDER: Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet due by 4/22/2019. Ready for SS Oral Argument the week of 9/9/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Amy Rydzewski (akr)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Social Security Appeal) by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development, #7 Medical Records Part 1, #8 Medical Records Part 2, #9 Medical Records Part 3, #10 Medical Records Part 4, #11 Medical Records Part 5)(RUSSELL, GWENDOLYN)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER.(RUSSELL, GWENDOLYN)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by GWENDOLYN N.J. RUSSELL on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (RUSSELL, GWENDOLYN)
February 7, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER : Answer due by 3/25/2019. (akr)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by SHARON ANN LEDESMA. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipts, #2 Proof of Delivery)(FENNER, RILEY)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 United States Attorney summons, #2 Attorney General summons)(bfa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SHARON ANN LEDESMA (bfa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by SHARON ANN LEDESMA. (Service of Process Deadline 4/22/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEDESMA v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON ANN LEDESMA
Represented By: RILEY L. FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: GWENDOLYN N.J. RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?