LANG et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND
Plaintiff: ROBERT LANG and STEPHEN CONGDON
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND
Case Number: 2:2019cv00049
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Confidentiality Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jib)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting without objection #9 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The court's scheduling order, ECF No. 8, is amended to permit up to 9 depositions per side, to permit a Request for Discovery Hearing to be filed upon service of the defendant's anticipated objection to any request for personnel records, and to provide that any motion to bifurcate the plaintiffs' claims for trial be filed by July 19, 2019, the existing L.R. 56(h) notice deadline. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG Responses due by 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order)(DIETERICH, AMY)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG Responses due by 3/26/2019. (DIETERICH, AMY)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/19/2019. Motions due by 8/2/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (CCS)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CITY OF PORTLAND.(TORREGROSSA, ANNE)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set Answer Deadline: Docket entry modified to reflect the answer deadline of 3/4/19 was calculated and set in error. The correct answer deadline for the City of Portland is 2/21/2019. (jib)
February 8, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for CITY OF PORTLAND: Answer due by 2/21/2019 pursuant to the summons returned executed with a proof of service date of 1/31/19. (jib)
February 7, 2019 *Filed in Error* SET Answer Deadline for CITY OF PORTLAND pursuant to ECF No. 5: Answer due by 3/4/2019. (nrg) Modified on 2/8/2019 to indicate this deadline was filed/set in error (jib).
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT LANG. CITY OF PORTLAND served on 1/31/2019. (DIETERICH, AMY) Modified on 2/8/2019 to change date served from 1/30/19 to 1/31/19 pursuant to the proof of service (jib).
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN PAYNE HAY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAY, JORDAN)
January 30, 2019 Filing Fee Received from STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 0100-1967196. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 01/30/2019 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PORTLAND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROBERT LANG, STEPHEN CONGDON. (Service of Process Deadline 4/29/2019) Fee due by 1/31/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LANG et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT LANG
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JORDAN PAYNE HAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN CONGDON
Represented By: AMY P. DIETERICH
Represented By: JORDAN PAYNE HAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND
Represented By: DANIELLE WEST-CHUHTA
Represented By: ANNE TORREGROSSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?