BRIGGS v. TOWN OF RUMFORD et al
Plaintiff: LINDA-JEAN BRIGGS
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER BRENNICK, TOWN OF RUMFORD, JOHN PEPIN, SR, MICHAEL PETER CHASE and JAMES WINDOVER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00059
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. WALL, III on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BRENNICK, MICHAEL PETER CHASE, JOHN PEPIN, SR, TOWN OF RUMFORD, JAMES WINDOVER (WALL, JOHN)
February 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for CHRISTOPHER BRENNICK, MICHAEL PETER CHASE, JOHN PEPIN, SR, TOWN OF RUMFORD, JAMES WINDOVER: Answer due by 4/23/2019. (jib)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #3 Waiver of the Service of Summons: Docket text modified to reflect the document title and to add party names. (jib)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of the Service of Summons filed by LINDA-JEAN BRIGGS as to All Defendants: Town of Rumford, Christopher Brennick, Michael Peter Cahse, John Pepin, Sr., James Windover. (MITTEL, ROBERT) Modified on 2/25/2019 to add Town of Rumford, Christopher Brennick, Michael Peter Cahse, John Pepin, Sr., James Windover( jib).
February 4, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1969520.), filed by LINDA-JEAN BRIGGS.(MITTEL, ROBERT)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LINDA-JEAN BRIGGS against CHRISTOPHER BRENNICK, MICHAEL PETER CHASE, JOHN PEPIN, SR, TOWN OF RUMFORD, JAMES WINDOVER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 5/2/2019) Fee due by 2/4/2019.(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRIGGS v. TOWN OF RUMFORD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER BRENNICK
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF RUMFORD
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN PEPIN, SR
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL PETER CHASE
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES WINDOVER
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA-JEAN BRIGGS
Represented By: MARIA FOX
Represented By: ROBERT E. MITTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?