GOULET v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC et al

Plaintiff: CRYSTAL GOULET
Defendant: GBD PROPERTIES INC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC
3Rd Party Defendant: UNITED SERVICE GROUP INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00064
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Third-Party Summons Returned Executed : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 5/8/2019 as to UNITED SERVICE GROUP INC. (jwr)
March 15, 2019 Set Answer to 3rd party complaint Deadline for UNITED SERVICE GROUP INC : Answer due by 4/5/2019. (jwr)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. UNITED SERVICE GROUP INC served on 3/15/2019. (BROSNIHAN, DAVID)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 Third-Party Summons Issued as to UNITED SERVICE GROUP INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jwr)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting relief requested in #15 Objection to Scheduling Order. The Scheduling Order deadlines are stayed. The Court will convene a telephonic conference with counsel to discuss a new scheduling order upon the entry of appearance by the third-party defendant. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against UNITED SERVICE GROUP INC filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. (Service of Process Deadline 6/11/2019)(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting without objection #13 Motion for Leave to File Third-party Complaint. Defendant shall file the third-party complaint on or before March 20, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 Joint OBJECTION to #11 Scheduling Order filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. Responses due by 4/3/2019. (POLANSKY, KEVIN) Modified on 3/14/2019 to remove duplicative docket text (jwr).
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CRYSTAL GOULET. (CLIFFORD, PETER)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC Responses due by 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit Third-Party Complaint)(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
March 5, 2019 Set Deadlines: Attorney DAVID A. BROSNIHAN shall register for the District of Maine's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) System by 3/7/2019. Registration Forms are available on the Court's website #http://www.med.uscourts.gov/ecf-registration under the Electronic Case Files, ECF Registration Section. (jgd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Brosnihan filed by KEVIN P. POLANSKY on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-1984471.) (Attachments: #1 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/15/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/22/2019. Motions due by 8/5/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Deadline for Filing Motion for Default as to defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. Counsel are to disregard this deadline as the answer was filed in state court and received in the filing of the state court record. (jwr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by GBD PROPERTIES INC, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Filing NOR, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Appearance, #4 Exhibit D NOR, #5 Exhibit E Answer of GBD, #6 Exhibit F Order, #7 Exhibit G Agreed Motion to Amend Complaint, #8 Exhibit H Amended Complaint, #9 Exhibit I Aff and Req for Default, #10 Exhibit J Standard Scheduling Order, #11 Exhibit K Affidavit of Service, #12 Exhibit L Notice of Appearance, #13 Exhibit M Answer of Whole Foods, #14 Exhibit N Complaint, #15 Exhibit O Summons)(POLANSKY, KEVIN) Modified on 2/19/2019 to add Exhibit "letters" (jwr).
February 19, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 3/20/2019 as to WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. (jwr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #7 State Court Record : This docket entry has been marked as filed in error, and counsel is instructed to refile at the Clerk's Office request. (jwr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR, TO BE REFILED**STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by GBD PROPERTIES INC, WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(POLANSKY, KEVIN) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jwr).
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by GBD PROPERTIES INC.(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
February 12, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1974547.), filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC, GBD PROPERTIES INC.(POLANSKY, KEVIN)
February 8, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC, GBD PROPERTIES INC : Answer due by 2/15/2019. (bfa)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 2/15/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GBD PROPERTIES INC. (bfa)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC. (bfa)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-18-491. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC, GBD PROPERTIES INC. (Service of Process Deadline 5/9/2019) Fee due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Request for Admissions, #5 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOULET v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL GOULET
Represented By: PETER CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP INC
Represented By: KEVIN P. POLANSKY
Represented By: DAVID A. BROSNIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GBD PROPERTIES INC
Represented By: KEVIN P. POLANSKY
Represented By: DAVID A. BROSNIHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: UNITED SERVICE GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?