SVIZZERO v. MEYERS

Plaintiff: STEPHEN M SVIZZERO
Defendant: JEFFREY A MEYERS
Interested Party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC, CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK and WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00072
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (HORNBY, D.)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting without objection #10 Motion to Substitute Party. By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (HORNBY, D.)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #9 Notice of Appearance: Docket entry modified to add ANDREW W. SPARKS. (jib)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC Responses due by 4/30/2019. (KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.(KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. (KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Party by MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC Responses due by 4/30/2019. (KENNEDY, WILLIAM)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM KENNEDY and ANDREW W. SPARKS on behalf of MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC (KENNEDY, WILLIAM) Modified on 4/10/2019 to add ANDREW W. SPARKS (jib).
March 12, 2019 Set Deadlines : No answer or responsive pleading filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc - Check for the Filing of a Motion for Entry of Default on 4/11/2019. (mnw)
February 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline JEFFREY A MEYERS: Answer due by 4/15/2019. (jib)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JEFFREY A MEYERS waiver sent on 2/14/2019. (SHUB, ADAM)
February 22, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC : Answer due by 3/11/2019. (jib)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by STEPHEN M SVIZZERO. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC served on 2/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Authorization letter)(SHUB, ADAM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
February 13, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1975495.), filed by STEPHEN M SVIZZERO.(SHUB, ADAM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JEFFREY A MEYERS, filed by STEPHEN M SVIZZERO. (Service of Process Deadline 5/14/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Lien, #2 Exhibit B - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Demand)(SHUB, ADAM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by STEPHEN M SVIZZERO of Camden National Bank Only (SHUB, ADAM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK, JEFFREY A MEYERS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Camden National Bank summons)(bfa)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEFFREY A MEYERS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by STEPHEN M SVIZZERO. (Service of Process Deadline 5/14/2019) Fee due by 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Lien, #2 Exhibit B - Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C - Demand)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SVIZZERO v. MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY A MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: WILLIAM KENNEDY
Represented By: ANDREW W. SPARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMDEN NATIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WELLS FARGO BANK NA
Represented By: WILLIAM KENNEDY
Represented By: ANDREW W. SPARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN M SVIZZERO
Represented By: ADAM J. SHUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?