COTE v. WMBE PAYROLLING INC et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH COTE
Defendant: BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC and WMBE PAYROLLING INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00082
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC. (UHL, ERIC)
April 17, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC - Per Order #8: Answer due by 5/20/2019. (mnw)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to May 20, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
April 17, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC by 4/24/2019. (mnw)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC Responses due by 5/8/2019. (UHL, ERIC)
March 7, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC - Per Order #6: Answer due by 4/18/2019. (mnw)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to April 18, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by JOSEPH COTE Responses due by 3/28/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
March 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC - Per Summons Returned Executed #4: Answer due by 3/21/2019. (mnw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH COTE. BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC served on 2/28/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
February 22, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1979768.), filed by JOSEPH COTE.(HANSEN, CHAD)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC, WMBE PAYROLLING INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Bio-Rad Laboratories, Inc summons)(bfa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC, WMBE PAYROLLING INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JOSEPH COTE. (Service of Process Deadline 5/23/2019) Fee due by 2/25/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COTE v. WMBE PAYROLLING INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH COTE
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIO-RAD LABORATORIES INC
Represented By: ERIC J. UHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMBE PAYROLLING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?