MCCANLESS v. NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC et al
Plaintiff: KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS
Defendant: NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC, AZIZ ELSHERIF and ELSHERIF GROUP LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00117
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Scheduling Order Deadlines. Parties to notify the court regarding mediation outcome no later than 9/27/2019. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Scheduling Order Deadlines by KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS Responses due by 7/31/2019. (COTTER, ANDREW)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 Reply to Counterclaim #10 by KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS. (COTTER, ANDREW) Modified on 5/14/2019 to clean-up docket text (jwr).
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AZIZ ELSHERIF, ELSHERIF GROUP LLC, NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC. (TOZIER, ALISON)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/13/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 9/20/2019. Motions due by 10/4/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/2/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (mjlt)
April 26, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/3/2019. (jwr)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS by AZIZ ELSHERIF, NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC, ELSHERIF GROUP LLC.(TOZIER, ALISON)
April 16, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline Regarding Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for AZIZ ELSHERIF, ELSHERIF GROUP LLC, NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC : Answer due by 4/26/2019. (jwr)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD L. O'MEARA on behalf of All Defendants (O'MEARA, RICHARD)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AZIZ ELSHERIF, ELSHERIF GROUP LLC, NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC Responses due by 5/6/2019. (TOZIER, ALISON)
April 1, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC, ELSHERIF GROUP LLC and AZIZ ELSHERIF : Answers due by 4/18/2019. (jwr)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS. AZIZ ELSHERIF served on 3/28/2019. (CLIFFORD, JAMES) Modified on 4/1/2019 to change event type (jwr).
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS. ELSHERIF GROUP LLC served on 3/28/2019. (CLIFFORD, JAMES) Modified on 4/1/2019 to change event type (jwr).
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS. NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC served on 3/28/2019. (CLIFFORD, JAMES) Modified on 4/1/2019 to event type (jwr).
March 22, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1993703.), filed by KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS.(CLIFFORD, JAMES)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AZIZ ELSHERIF, ELSHERIF GROUP LLC, NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Elsherif Group, LLC summons, #2 Aziz Elsherif summons)(bfa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AZIZ ELSHERIF, ELSHERIF GROUP LLC, NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS. (Service of Process Deadline 6/18/2019) Fee due by 3/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - March 15, 2017 notification to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit 2 - 4/6/17 emails)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCANLESS v. NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTOPHER MCCANLESS
Represented By: ANDREW P. COTTER
Represented By: JAMES A. CLIFFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW ENGLAND HOTEL AND RESTAURANT GROUP LLC
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Represented By: ALISON E. TOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZIZ ELSHERIF
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Represented By: ALISON E. TOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELSHERIF GROUP LLC
Represented By: RICHARD L. O'MEARA
Represented By: ALISON E. TOZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?