US BANK TRUST NA v. MOORE et al

Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA
Defendant: ELAINE G MOORE and BRYAN G MOORE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00149
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Reset Deadlines Regarding Order on Motion to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Elaine G. Moore : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 8/16/2019. (jwr)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Elaine G. Moore By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue deadline to file Motion for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Elaine G. Moore by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 7/2/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default as to ELAINE MOORE on 6/17/2019. (jwr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. ELAINE G MOORE served on 4/19/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BRYAN G MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
April 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for BRYAN G MOORE: Answer due by 5/9/2019. (jgd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. BRYAN G MOORE served on 4/18/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT With Certificate of Service by US BANK TRUST NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 10, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004004.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA.(DOONAN, JOHN)
April 10, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from US BANK TRUST NA by 4/17/2019. (slg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ELAINE G MOORE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRYAN G MOORE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRYAN G MOORE, ELAINE G MOORE, filed by US BANK TRUST NA. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 7/9/2019) Fee due by 4/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment into BAC, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment into Nationstar, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank, #7 Exhibit G - Quitclaim Assignment, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA v. MOORE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELAINE G MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN G MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?