JONES v. PORTER
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE JONES
Defendant: ROBERT PORTER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00151
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/27/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/4/2019. Motions due by 10/18/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (akr)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROBERT PORTER re #7 Answer to Complaint, #6 Notice of Appearance (FELDMAN, MICHAEL)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ROBERT PORTER.(FELDMAN, MICHAEL)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. FELDMAN on behalf of All Defendants (FELDMAN, MICHAEL)
April 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ROBERT PORTER per summons returned executed filed on 4/29/2019: Answer due by 5/13/2019. (lrc)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed - ROBERT PORTER served on 4/22/2019. (FELDMAN, DANIEL) Modified on 4/29/2019 to clarify docket text (lrc).
April 11, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2004457.), filed by CHARMAINE JONES.(FELDMAN, DANIEL)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ROBERT PORTER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL D. FELDMAN on behalf of CHARMAINE JONES (bfa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT PORTER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CHARMAINE JONES. (Service of Process Deadline 7/10/2019) Fee due by 4/15/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. PORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT PORTER
Represented By: MICHAEL A. FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARMAINE JONES
Represented By: DANIEL D. FELDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?