US BANK TRUST NA v. LANDSMAN et al

Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA
Defendant: DAWN LANDSMAN, DAWN L BEAUCHAMP and LOUIS J BEAUCHAMP
Interested Party: CACH LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00156
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Affidavit of Service : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/29/2019 as to DAWN LANDSMAN. (jwr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by US BANK TRUST NA. DAWN LANDSMAN served on 5/14/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to CACH LLC Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 7/22/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Party-in-Interest, CACH, LLC by US BANK TRUST NA Responses due by 7/11/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Louis J. Beauchamp by US BANK TRUST NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Death Certificate for Louis J. Beauchamp)(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 24, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 6/24/2019 as to CACH LLC. (jwr)
May 8, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for CACH LLC : Answer due by 5/23/2019. (jwr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA. CACH LLC served on 5/2/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 7.1 by US BANK TRUST NA. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 15, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2005573.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 12, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from US BANK TRUST NA by 4/19/2019. (slg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CACH LLC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LOUIS J BEAUCHAMP. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DAWN LANDSMAN. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOUIS J BEAUCHAMP, CACH LLC, DAWN LANDSMAN, filed by US BANK TRUST NA. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 7/11/2019) Fee due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Asssignment into Nationstar, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment into HUD, #6 Exhibit F - Assignment into U.S. Bank, #7 Exhibit G - Order Nunc Pro Tunc, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA v. LANDSMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWN LANDSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAWN L BEAUCHAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS J BEAUCHAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CACH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?