US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. MOORE
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Defendant: SHANNON R MOORE
Interested Party: STEVE THOMES
Case Number: 2:2019cv00157
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 11/8/2019 as to STEVE THOMES. (sfw) Modified on 7/3/2019 to clarify docket text(sfw).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/18/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/25/2019. Motions due by 11/8/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (sfw)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to STEVE THOMES Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 7/1/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Party-in-Interest, Steve Thomes by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST Responses due by 6/20/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 14, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 6/13/2019 as to STEVE THOMES. (sfw)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SHANNON R MOORE.(sfw)
April 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for STEVE THOMES : Answer due by 5/13/2019. (sfw)
April 29, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for SHANNON MOORE : Answer due by 5/9/2019. (sfw)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. STEVE THOMES served on 4/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. SHANNON R MOORE served on 4/18/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 7.1 by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 15, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2005545.), filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST.(LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 12, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/18/2019. (akr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SHANNON R MOORE, STEVE THOMES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons - Steve Thomes)(akr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET (akr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHANNON R MOORE PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST. (Service of Process Deadline 7/11/2019) Fee due by 4/15/2019.(akr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2019: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment to Aurora, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment to US Bank, #6 Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment, #7 Exhibit G - Assignment to DLJ Mortgage, #8 Exhibit H - Assignment to US Bank, #9 Exhibit I - Loan Modification, #10 Exhibit J - Demand Letter, #11 Exhibit K - Affidavit Relating to Military Search) (akr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST v. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STEVE THOMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON R MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US BANK TRUST NA AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?