BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON v. GILBERT et al

Plaintiff: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Defendant: CATHY M GILBERT and LEROY W GILBERT
Case Number: 2:2019cv00158
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2006257.), filed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON.(CROUTER, MATTHEW)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CATHY M GILBERT, LEROY W GILBERT. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons for Cathy Gilbert)(jwr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON. (jwr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Attorney List)(jwr)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON against CATHY M GILBERT, LEROY W GILBERT PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 7/11/2019) Fee due by 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Adjustable Rate Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D1 and D2 - Assignment of Mortgage, #5 Exhibit E - Right to Cure Notice of Default, #6 Exhibit F - PS fomr 3665, #7 Exhibit G - Status Report)(jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON v. GILBERT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHY M GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEROY W GILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON
Represented By: SANTO LONGO
Represented By: CARLY J. TRAUB
Represented By: ANDREW J. SCHAEFER
Represented By: MATTHEW CROUTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?