MARCOU v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER

Plaintiff: FRED L MARCOU
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00159
Filed: April 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 PROCEDURAL ORDER: Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet due by 7/17/2019. Ready for SS Oral Argument the week of 12/9/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Lindsey Caron. (lrc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Social Security Appeal) by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. (Attachments: #1 Court transcript index, #2 Documents related to admin process, #3 Payment documents & decisions, #4 Jurisdictional documents & notices, #5 Non disability related development, #6 Disability related development, #7 Medical records 2016 1, #8 Medical records 2016 2, #9 Medical records 2016 3, #10 Medical records 2016 4, #11 Medical records 2016 5, #12 Documents related to admin process 2019, #13 Payment documents & decisions 2019, #14 Jurisdictional documents & notices 2019, #15 Non disability related development 2019, #16 Disability related development 2019, #17 Medical records 2019 1, #18 Medical records 2019 2)(OELTJEN, NATASHA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER.(OELTJEN, NATASHA)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by NATASHA OELTJEN on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (OELTJEN, NATASHA)
April 30, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER per Affidavit of Service filed on 4/30/2019, the United States Attorney for the District of Maine was served on 4/17/2019: Answer due by 6/17/2019. (lrc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service by FRED L MARCOU. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER served on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipts, #2 Proof of Delivery)(FENNER, RILEY)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 United States Attorney summons, #2 Attorney General summons)(bfa)
April 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FRED L MARCOU (bfa)
April 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER, filed by FRED L MARCOU. (Service of Process Deadline 7/15/2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARCOU v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED L MARCOU
Represented By: RILEY L. FENNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: NATASHA OELTJEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?