FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. HICKS et al

Plaintiff: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Defendant: SANDRA D HICKS and PETER R HICKS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00161
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to SANDRA D HICKS Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 7/31/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Susan Way. (sfw)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Sandra D. Hicks by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION Responses due by 7/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
May 29, 2019 Set Deadlines Regarding Summons Returned Executed as to Sandra Hicks : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 7/1/2019. (jwr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. SANDRA D HICKS served on 4/24/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to PETER R HICKS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by RENEAU J. LONGORIA on behalf of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION (LONGORIA, RENEAU)
April 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2006445.), filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(DOONAN, JOHN)
April 16, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/23/2019. (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PETER R HICKS, SANDRA D HICKS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Sandra D. Hicks summons)(bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PETER R HICKS, SANDRA D HICKS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. (Service of Process Deadline 7/15/2019) Fee due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B Note, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Assignment into Freedom, #5 Exhibit E Quitclaim Assignment into Freedom, #6 Exhibit F Demand Letter, #7 Exhibit G Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION v. HICKS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA D HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER R HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: JOHN A. DOONAN
Represented By: RENEAU J. LONGORIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?