SPRINGER v. ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC et al
Plaintiff: AIMEE R SPRINGER
Defendant: ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC and SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL
Case Number: 2:2019cv00167
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC and SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL per Order No. 11 entered on 6/12/2019: Answers due by 9/3/2019. (lrc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting without objection #10 Joint Motion to Stay pending judicial settlement conference. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by September 3, 2019, one week following the currently scheduled judicial settlement conference. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Completion of Judicial Settlement Conference by AIMEE R SPRINGER Responses due by 7/2/2019. (WICKS, VALERIE)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Settlement Conference for 8/27/2019 08:30 AM in Portland Bankruptcy Court before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON, In Camera Settlement Papers due by 8/20/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
June 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL per summons returned executed filed on 6/4/2019: Answer due by 6/13/2019. (lrc)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIMEE R SPRINGER. SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL served on 5/23/2019. (WICKS, VALERIE)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CAROL GARVAN on behalf of AIMEE R SPRINGER (GARVAN, CAROL)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID G. WEBBERT on behalf of AIMEE R SPRINGER (WEBBERT, DAVID)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy G. Kenneally filed by MICHAEL E. FOLEY on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 100 receipt number 0100-2026025.) (FOLEY, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC per summons returned executed filed on 5/22/2019: Answer due by 6/12/2019. (lrc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIMEE R SPRINGER. ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC served on 5/22/2019. (WICKS, VALERIE)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC, SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Service Corporation International summons)(bfa)
April 18, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2007895.), filed by AIMEE R SPRINGER.(WEBBERT, DAVID)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC, SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by AIMEE R SPRINGER. (Service of Process Deadline 7/17/2019) Fee due by 4/22/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRINGER v. ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECI SERVICES OF MAINE INC
Represented By: MICHAEL E. FOLEY
Represented By: TIMOTHY G. KENNEALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: MICHAEL E. FOLEY
Represented By: TIMOTHY G. KENNEALLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIMEE R SPRINGER
Represented By: DAVID G. WEBBERT
Represented By: VALERIE Z. WICKS
Represented By: CAROL GARVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?