MCCLEERY et al v. ZIMMER INC et al
Plaintiff: JOHN MCCLEERY and DEBORAH MCCLEERY
Defendant: ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC and ZIMMER US INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00179
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to Southern District of New York has been opened on 5/14/2019 as case 1:19-cv-04361. (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Interdistrict transfer to District of Southern District of New York (jwr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MDL CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (akr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (akr)
April 29, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2011819.), filed by JOHN MCCLEERY, DEBORAH MCCLEERY.(FITZGERALD, KEVIN)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER sent to MDL Panel. (bfa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER US INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Zimmer US, Inc summons, #2 Zimmer, Inc summons)(bfa)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
April 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC, ZIMMER INC, ZIMMER US INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by JOHN MCCLEERY, DEBORAH MCCLEERY. (Service of Process Deadline 7/25/2019) Fee due by 4/29/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCLEERY et al v. ZIMMER INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER BIOMET HOLDINGS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZIMMER US INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MCCLEERY
Represented By: KEVIN M. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH MCCLEERY
Represented By: KEVIN M. FITZGERALD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?