MCKENNEY v. KORTES et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT W MCKENNEY
Defendant: MAJOR TIMOTHY KORTES and CAPTAIN STEVE BUTTS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00186
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT W MCKENNEY of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office previously notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerks Office regarding collection of fees (mjlt)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 INDICATION by Prisoner ROBERT W MCKENNEY of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mjlt)
May 13, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings : Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 6/3/2019. (mtm)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's intent to proceed due by 6/3/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/13/2019 to correct typo) (mtm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCKENNEY v. KORTES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT W MCKENNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR TIMOTHY KORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN STEVE BUTTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?