DUFFY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Plaintiff: JOYCE DUFFY
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv00203
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/10/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/17/2019. Motions due by 10/31/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Entry of Appearance, #2 Exhibit B-Civil Summary Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-Complaint and Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Answer, #5 Exhibit E-Standard Scheduling Order, #6 Exhibit F-Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit G-DRM Affidavit)(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
May 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines : State Court Record due by 5/24/2019. (akr) Modified on 5/17/2019 to correct date filed(akr).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Record. Time is extended to May 24, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Extend Time to Submit State Court Record by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP Responses due by 6/5/2019. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 5/15/2019 to change event type to motion to extend time (lrc).
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement : This docket entry was modified to reflect that it was filed in error and will be re-filed by counsel. (lrc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR** CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (MAWHINNEY, DANIEL) Modified on 5/15/2019 to reflect that this filing was made in error and will be re-filed by counsel (lrc).
May 9, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2017372.), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP.(MAWHINNEY, DANIEL)
May 8, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/15/2019. (bfa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 5/15/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-11. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST LP. (Service of Process Deadline 8/6/2019) Fee due by 5/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 summons, #3 answer)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUFFY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE DUFFY
Represented By: DAVID S. BISCHOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
Represented By: DANIEL R. MAWHINNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?