REYNOLDS v. WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC RETAIL STORE #2081
Plaintiff: MARK D REYNOLDS
Defendant: WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC RETAIL STORE #2081
Case Number: 2:2019cv00209
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 Certified Mail Service Returned on 6/17/19 as to WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC RETAIL STORE #2081 c/o Norma Farmer CMI/AC. (jwr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Change Venue to Bangor by MARK D REYNOLDS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
June 27, 2019 USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (jwr)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE: The Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service by the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal may attempt service by waivers in the first instance. If no waiver(s) is/are timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare summons(es) for service in hand by the U.S. Marshal. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jwr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by MARK D REYNOLDS (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER regarding collection of filing fees. (jwr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 INDICATION by Prisoner MARK D REYNOLDS of Intent to Proceed; Prison Business office notified. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwr)
May 14, 2019 Set Deadlines : Prisoner Intent to Proceed Deadline 6/3/2019. (mtm)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARK D REYNOLDS (bfa)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC RETAIL STORE #2081 with Jury Demand, filed by MARK D REYNOLDS. (Service of Process Deadline 8/7/2019) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REYNOLDS v. WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC RETAIL STORE #2081
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK D REYNOLDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC RETAIL STORE #2081
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?