BOLZ v. BOUCHER
Plaintiff: WILLIAM R BOLZ
Defendant: JEAN A BOUCHER
Case Number: 2:2019cv00212
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JEAN A BOUCHER waiver sent on 6/14/2019. (VAN HOUTEN, THOMAS)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/12/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 11/18/2019. Motions due by 12/2/2019. Ready for Trial on 2/3/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JEAN A BOUCHER.(VEILLEUX, JOHN)
May 13, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2018750.), filed by WILLIAM R BOLZ.(VAN HOUTEN, THOMAS)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JEAN A BOUCHER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (sfw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (sfw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JEAN A BOUCHER with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by WILLIAM R BOLZ. (Service of Process Deadline 8/8/2019) Fee due by 5/13/2019.(sfw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOLZ v. BOUCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM R BOLZ
Represented By: THOMAS G. VAN HOUTEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEAN A BOUCHER
Represented By: JOHN R. VEILLEUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?