TUCKER v. TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
Plaintiff: GLENN TUCKER
Defendant: TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
Case Number: 2:2019cv00213
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/3/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/10/2019. Motions due by 10/24/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (mtm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH.(FRANCO, MARK)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY E. STEIGELMAN on behalf of TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH (STEIGELMAN, TIMOTHY)
May 13, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2018622.), filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH.(FRANCO, MARK)
May 13, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH : Answer due by 5/17/2019. (bfa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH. (Attachments: #1 docket record, #2 summary sheet, #3 complaint, #4 summons, #5 motion to extend time to file proof of service, #6 order granting motion to extend time to file proof of service)(bfa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2018-542. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH. (Service of Process Deadline 8/8/2019) Fee due by 5/13/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TUCKER v. TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF SCARBOROUGH
Represented By: MARK V. FRANCO
Represented By: TIMOTHY E. STEIGELMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN TUCKER
Represented By: SARAH A. CHURCHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?