DOYLE v. TOWN OF FALMOUTH
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DOYLE
Defendant: TOWN OF FALMOUTH
Case Number: 2:2019cv00229
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: D BROCK HORNBY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
2 Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY recused. Case randomly reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN for all further proceedings By JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (clp)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MICHAEL DOYLE. Reply due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(clp)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by TOWN OF FALMOUTH Responses due by 6/18/2019. (HEWEY, MELISSA)
May 22, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for TOWN OF FALMOUTH : Answer due by 5/28/2019. (bfa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD and Affidavit by TOWN OF FALMOUTH. (Attachments: #1 docket record, #2 complaint, #3 summary sheet, #4 return of service)(bfa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MALINA DUMAS on behalf of TOWN OF FALMOUTH (DUMAS, MALINA)
May 21, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2023046.), filed by TOWN OF FALMOUTH.(HEWEY, MELISSA)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cumberland County Superior Court, case number CV-2019-150. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by TOWN OF FALMOUTH. (Service of Process Deadline 8/19/2019) Fee due by 5/23/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOYLE v. TOWN OF FALMOUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF FALMOUTH
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Represented By: MALINA DUMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?