LITALIEN v. CITY OF BIDDEFORD

Plaintiff: JASON G LITALIEN
Defendant: CITY OF BIDDEFORD
Case Number: 2:2019cv00237
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 11/8/2019. Motions due by 11/22/2019. Ready for Trial on 1/10/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jwr)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by CITY OF BIDDEFORD.(JACQUES, KEITH)
May 24, 2019 Filing Fee Received from JASON G LITALIEN: Amount Paid: 400.00. Receipt Number: 219001070. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Civil Filing Fee. Date Paid: 5/24/2019 (jwr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JASON G LITALIEN. CITY OF BIDDEFORD served on 5/24/2019.Answer due by 6/14/2019. (jwr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance form filed by JASON G LITALIEN (slg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CITY OF BIDDEFORD. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF BIDDEFORD, filed by JASON G LITALIEN PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 8/22/2019) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Parking Kiosk Picture, #2 Affidavit of H. Howard Hanson, #3 Affidavit of Donna Day, #4 Affidavit of Vincent Keely, #5 Affidavit of Tina Maurice-Richardson, #6 Affidavit of Gray Sexton)(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LITALIEN v. CITY OF BIDDEFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF BIDDEFORD
Represented By: KEITH R. JACQUES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON G LITALIEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?