CLEAN-O-RAMA INC v. COMMERCIAL DEPARTMENT CONTAINERS CDC CANADA INC et al
Plaintiff: CLEAN-O-RAMA INC
Defendant: COMMERCIAL DEPARTMENT CONTAINERS CDC CANADA INC, CDC CANADA INC, HAPAG-LLOYD AG, SAVINO DEL BENE USA INC and DEPARTEMENT COMMERCIAL DE CONTENEURS CDC CANADA INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00239
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SAVINO DEL BENE USA INC per Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed on 6/4/2019: Answer due by 7/29/2019. (lrc)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed SAVINO DEL BENE USA INC waiver sent on 5/29/2019 . (MEYER, F.) Modified on 6/4/2019 to reflect a correct waiver sent date (lrc).
May 29, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2026350.), filed by CLEAN-O-RAMA INC.(MEYER, F.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CLEAN-O-RAMA INC. (bfa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMERCIAL DEPARTMENT CONTAINERS CDC CANADA INC, HAPAG-LLOYD AG, SAVINO DEL BENE USA INC PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CLEAN-O-RAMA INC. (Service of Process Deadline 8/22/2019) Fee due by 5/28/2019.(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLEAN-O-RAMA INC v. COMMERCIAL DEPARTMENT CONTAINERS CDC CANADA INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMERCIAL DEPARTMENT CONTAINERS CDC CANADA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC CANADA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAPAG-LLOYD AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVINO DEL BENE USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTEMENT COMMERCIAL DE CONTENEURS CDC CANADA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEAN-O-RAMA INC
Represented By: F. JAY MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?