GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC v. WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION

Plaintiff: GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC
Defendant: WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00257
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. GIFFUNE on behalf of GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC (GIFFUNE, JOHN)
June 25, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION : Answer due by 8/23/2019. (jwr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION waiver sent on 6/24/2019. (SEGAL, STEPHEN)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC. (SEGAL, STEPHEN)
June 6, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2031067.), filed by GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC.(SEGAL, STEPHEN)
June 6, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/13/2019. (bfa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC. (Service of Process Deadline 9/4/2019) Fee due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposal, #2 Exhibit B - Breach Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Termination)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC v. WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILCOX INDUSTRIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL DYNAMICS - OTS INC
Represented By: STEPHEN B. SEGAL
Represented By: JOHN P. GIFFUNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?