DURRELL v. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC
Plaintiff: ALICIA DURRELL
Defendant: SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00278
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/2/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/8/2020. Motions due by 1/22/2020. Ready for Trial on 4/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (akr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC.(CATERINE, MELINDA)
August 6, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC : Answer due by 8/13/2019. (akr)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to August 13, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC Responses due by 8/27/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
July 24, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC : Answer due by 8/6/2019. (akr)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to August 6, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC Responses due by 8/13/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
July 12, 2019 Reset Answer Deadline for SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC : Answer due by 7/30/2019. (akr)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to July 30, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
July 12, 2019 Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/19/2019 as to SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC. (akr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC Responses due by 8/2/2019. (CATERINE, MELINDA)
July 1, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC : Answer due by 7/16/2019. (tcs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALICIA DURRELL. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC served on 6/25/2019. (HANSEN, CHAD)
June 19, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2037148.), filed by ALICIA DURRELL.(HANSEN, CHAD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (slg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (slg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC, filed by ALICIA DURRELL with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS.. (Service of Process Deadline 9/17/2019) Fee due by 6/21/2019.(slg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DURRELL v. SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA INC
Represented By: MELINDA J. CATERINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA DURRELL
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?