LAMPROS v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Plaintiff: JUSTIN AARON LAMPROS
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00325
Filed: July 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JON D LEVY
Referring Judge: JOHN H RICH
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER : Answer due by 9/23/2019. (akr)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by JUSTIN AARON LAMPROS. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts)(CASA, CHRISTINE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS J. GEORGE on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (GEORGE, LOUIS)
July 15, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2048182.), filed by JUSTIN AARON LAMPROS.(CASA, CHRISTINE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: U.S. Attorney Summons (Attachments: #1 Attorney General Summons, #2 Regional Chief Counsel Summons)(mnw)
July 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnw)
July 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER filed by JUSTIN AARON LAMPROS. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) Fee due by 7/16/2019.(mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAMPROS v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN AARON LAMPROS
Represented By: CHRISTINE W. CASA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
Represented By: LOUIS J. GEORGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?