CRONKITE et al v. HARRINGTON
Appellant: RAYMOND E CRONKITE and DIANE L'HEUREUX
Appellee: WILLIAM K HARRINGTON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00326
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time to File Brief and Appendix filed by RAYMOND E CRONKITE, DIANE L'HEUREUX (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mnw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION To Be Terminated As Named Appellee (and Notice of Non-Participation) (With Certificate of Service) by WILLIAM K HARRINGTON Responses due by 9/9/2019. (BRADFORD, ERIC)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Appeal Procedural Order - Appellant(s) Brief and Appendix due by 9/11/2019. By Melody Whitten, Deputy Clerk (mnw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Certificate of Readiness received. (Attachments: #1 Joint Filing of Designation of Records and Statement of Issues, #2 Notice Recipients)(mnw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Appeal (the record on appeal is available at ecf.meb.uscourts.gov) received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court; Bankruptcy Court case number 09-20451., filed by RAYMOND E CRONKITE, DIANE L'HEUREUX. (Check for Bankruptcy Appeal Certificate of Readiness 8/26/2019.) (Attachments: #1 appeal transmittal form, #2 order, #3 docket sheet, #4 notice recipients, #5 statement of election)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRONKITE et al v. HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RAYMOND E CRONKITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DIANE L'HEUREUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WILLIAM K HARRINGTON
Represented By: STEPHEN G. MORRELL
Represented By: ERIC K. BRADFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?