DOE v. REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21 et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Defendant: JASON SULLIVAN, REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21, BRUCE LEWIA and JILL LAMONTAGNE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00341
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: GEORGE Z SINGAL
2 Judge: NANCY TORRESEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym : Response by JILL LAMONTAGNE due by 9/12/2019. (mnw)
September 4, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for JILL LAMONTAGNE - Per Summons Returned Executed #11: Answer due by 9/12/2019. (mnw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. JILL LAMONTAGNE served on 8/22/2019. (BREWSTER, SETH)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN for all further proceedings By JUDGE GEORGE Z. SINGAL. (lrc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MELISSA A. HEWEY on behalf of BRUCE LEWIA, REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21, JASON SULLIVAN (HEWEY, MELISSA)
August 5, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21, JASON SULLIVAN, and BRUCE LEWIA per Waivers of Service Returned Executed filed on 8/5/2019: Answer due by 9/30/2019. (lrc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed BRUCE LEWIA waiver sent on 7/31/2019. (BREWSTER, SETH)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed JASON SULLIVAN waiver sent on 7/31/2019. (BREWSTER, SETH)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21 waiver sent on 7/31/2019. (BREWSTER, SETH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21, JILL LAMONTAGNE, JASON SULLIVAN & BRUCE LEWIA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: Summons to RSU 21 (Attachments: #1 Summons to Jill Lamontagne, #2 Summons to Jason Sullivan, #3 Summons to Bruce Lewia)(mnw)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER reserving ruling re #3 Motion to proceed under pseudonym. The court reserves ruling until defendants have been served and had an opportunity to state their positions. The plaintiff is DIRECTED to serve a copy of his motion along with the summons and complaint herein. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
July 19, 2019 Filing Fee Received from JOHN DOE: Amount Paid: $400.00. Receipt Number: 219001340. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Civil Case Opening Filing Fee. Date Paid: 7/19/2019. (mnw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by JOHN DOE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Doe v. Swarthmore College, No. 2:14-cv-00532-SD)(mnw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21, JILL LAMONTAGNE, JASON SULLIVAN & BRUCE LEWIA, with Jury Demand, filed by JOHN DOE. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 10/17/2019) Fee due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RSU 21's Policy on Staff Conduct with Students, #2 Exhibit B - RSU 21's Policy on Harassment and Sexual Harassment of Students)(mnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON SULLIVAN
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONAL SCHOOL UNIT NO 21
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE LEWIA
Represented By: MELISSA A. HEWEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL LAMONTAGNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: SETH W. BREWSTER
Represented By: MICAH A. SMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?