TULLEY v. SURE WINNER FOODS
Plaintiff: STEPHEN TULLEY
Defendant: SURE WINNER FOODS
Case Number: 2:2019cv00379
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH KENT HALL on behalf of SURE WINNER FOODS (HALL, SARAH)
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 1/17/2020. Motions due by 1/31/2020. Ready for Trial on 4/6/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (tcs)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by SURE WINNER FOODS.(FINBERG, FREDERICK)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD with Affidavit by SURE WINNER FOODS. (Attachments: #1 Docket Record, #2 Complaint, #3 Superior Court Summary Sheet, #4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(FINBERG, FREDERICK)
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2064283.), filed by SURE WINNER FOODS.(FINBERG, FREDERICK)
August 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline for SURE WINNER FOODS : Answer due by 8/23/2019. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 8/23/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SURE WINNER FOODS. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Superior Court, case number CV-19-103. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by SURE WINNER FOODS. (Service of Process Deadline 11/14/2019) Fee due by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - complaint, #2 Exhibit B - summary sheet, #3 Exhibit C - acknowledgment of summons and complaint, #4 Exhibit D - notice of filing otice of removal)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TULLEY v. SURE WINNER FOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURE WINNER FOODS
Represented By: FREDERICK B. FINBERG
Represented By: SARAH KENT HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN TULLEY
Represented By: SARAH A. CHURCHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?