FEDEQ DV004 LLC et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
Plaintiff: FEDEQ DV004 LLC and FEDEQ DV005 LLC
Defendant: JON P JENNINGS and CITY OF PORTLAND
Case Number: 2:2019cv00382
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN H RICH
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
2 Judge: JOHN A WOODCOCK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/26/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/4/2020. Motions due by 3/18/2020. Ready for Trial on 5/4/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (tcs)
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. VENNE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (VENNE, PATRICK)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/26/2020. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 3/4/2020. Motions due by 3/18/2020. Ready for Trial on 5/4/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (tcs)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by CITY OF PORTLAND.(WALL, JOHN)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Maine Tort Claims Act Immunity by JON P JENNINGS Responses due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Danielle West-Chuhta with Exh. 1 Employment Contract of City Manager Jon Jennings)(PIERCE, RUSSELL)
September 9, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Pursuant to Order at ECF #12 : Answer from City of Portland and Jon P. Jennings due by 10/8/2019. (tcs)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants shall respond to the plaintiffs' complaint by October 8, 2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer filed by CITY OF PORTLAND. (WALL, JOHN)
September 3, 2019 Case Randomly Reassigned to JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (jwr)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER recused. By JUDGE LANCE E. WALKER. (jwr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by RUSSELL PIERCE on behalf of JON P JENNINGS (PIERCE, RUSSELL)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer filed by FEDEQ DV004 LLC, FEDEQ DV005 LLC. Reply due by 9/13/2019. (ECONOMY, ALLISON)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN J. WALL, III on behalf of CITY OF PORTLAND (WALL, JOHN)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by CITY OF PORTLAND, JON P JENNINGS Responses due by 9/16/2019. (THOMPSON, JENNIFER)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER L. THOMPSON on behalf of All Defendants (THOMPSON, JENNIFER)
August 19, 2019 Filing Fee Received from FEDEQ DV004 LLC, FEDEQ DV005 LLC: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 219001468. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 8/19/19 re #1 Complaint. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CITY OF PORTLAND, JON P JENNINGS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Jon Jennings summons)(bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDEQ DV004 LLC, FEDEQ DV005 LLC. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND, JON P JENNINGS PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDEQ DV004 LLC, FEDEQ DV005 LLC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/14/2019) Fee due by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit B- Garage Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Jobs Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Guarantee, #5 Exhibit E - First Amendment, #6 Exhibit F - October 2014 Amendments, #7 Exhibit G - Somerset Street Agreement, #8 Exhibit H - Second Amended Guarantee, #9 Exhibit I - Third Amendment, #10 Exhibit J - Amended Third Amendment, #11 Exhibit K - Second Amended Third Amendment, #12 Exhibit L - May 2016 Amendments, #13 Exhibit M - Remaining Conditions Letter, #14 Exhibit N - MDP Confirmation Letter, #15 Exhibit O - March 2018 Letter, #16 Exhibit P - February 2019 Letter, #17 Exhibit Q - email dated March 4, 2019)(bfa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDEQ DV004 LLC et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDEQ DV004 LLC
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Represented By: PATRICK J. VENNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDEQ DV005 LLC
Represented By: ALLISON A. ECONOMY
Represented By: PATRICK J. VENNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JON P JENNINGS
Represented By: JENNIFER L. THOMPSON
Represented By: RUSSELL PIERCE
Represented By: DANIELLE WEST-CHUHTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PORTLAND
Represented By: JENNIFER L. THOMPSON
Represented By: JOHN J. WALL, III
Represented By: DANIELLE WEST-CHUHTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?