CRAWFORD v. AR DENTAL LLC et al
Plaintiff: T ANTHONY CRAWFORD
Defendant: AR DENTAL LLC and ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00402
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maine
Presiding Judge: JOHN C NIVISON
Referring Judge: LANCE E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC. (STROCK, DAVID)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AR DENTAL LLC. (STROCK, DAVID)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by AR DENTAL LLC, ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC.(STROCK, DAVID)
October 3, 2019 Reset Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 11/4/2019 as to ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC and AR DENTAL LLC. (jwr)
September 27, 2019 Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 10/28/2019 as to ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC. (jwr)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for AR DENTAL LLC : Answer due by 10/2/2019. (jwr)
September 16, 2019 Set Answer Deadline Regarding Summons Returned Executed for ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC : Answer due by 9/26/2019. (jwr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T ANTHONY CRAWFORD. AR DENTAL LLC served on 9/11/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T ANTHONY CRAWFORD. ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC served on 9/5/2019. (TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AR DENTAL LLC, ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). Main Document: ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC (Attachments: #1 AR Dental LLC)(slg)
September 3, 2019 Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2072009.), filed by T ANTHONY CRAWFORD.(TOWNSEND, ALLAN)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mtm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AR DENTAL LLC, ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by T ANTHONY CRAWFORD. (Service of Process Deadline 11/29/2019) Fee due by 9/3/2019.(mtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maine District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRAWFORD v. AR DENTAL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T ANTHONY CRAWFORD
Represented By: ALLAN K. TOWNSEND
Represented By: CHAD T. HANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AR DENTAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN DENTAL MANAGEMENT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?